KY HB193 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - line items vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - line items vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Transportation Cabinet Budget: Detail Part I, Operating Budget; appropriate to General Administration and Support: 2020-2021: $88,284,200, 2021-2022: $88,774,500; appropriate to Aviation: 2020-2021: $24,691,100, 2021-2022: $18,540,500; appropriate to Debt Service: 2020-2021: $147,991,400, 2021-2022: $139,139,600; appropriate to Highways: 2020-2021: $1,984,387,400, 2021-2022: $1,984,774,400; appropriate to Public Transportation: 2020-2021: $81,080,000, 2021-2022: $40,481,700; appropriate to Revenue Sharing: 2020-2021: $335,267,500, 2021-2022: $341,480,300; appropriate to Vehicle Regulation: 2020-2021: $63,513,500, 2021-2022: $63,983,400; not included in the appropriation amounts are capital project amounts as follows: 2020-2021: $14,640,000, 2021-2022: $12,190,000; detail Part II, Capital Projects Budget; detail Part III, Funds Transfer; detail Part IV, Transportation Cabinet Budget Summary; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to appropriations providing financing and conditions for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 429 (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1805 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Consider Motion RCS# 380 (Y: 68 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL FCCR RSN# 1786 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1517 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 28 (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1805 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Consider Motion RCS# 380 (Y: 68 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL FCCR RSN# 1786 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1517 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 28 (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | line items vetoed |
2021-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill passed 83-8 |
2021-03-29 | House | Free Conference Committee report #2 adopted in House |
2021-03-29 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report #2 |
2021-03-29 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-29 | House | Free Conference Committee Report #2 filed in House |
2021-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | received in House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Bill passed 35-1 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Free Conference Committee Report #2 adopted in Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Free Conference Committee Report # 1 reconsidered |
2021-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report #2 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Free Conference Committee Report # 2 filed in Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | returned to Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-16 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report |
2021-03-16 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Bill passed 33-0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute |
2021-01-13 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-01-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-01-13 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-01-13 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for concurrence or non-concurrence |
2021-01-13 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-01-13 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-01-13 | House | received in House |
2021-01-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0-1 with Committee Substitute |
2021-01-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2021-01-12 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-01-11 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-01-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 74-20 with Committee Substitute |
2021-01-11 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-01-11 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-01-11 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2021-01-09 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-01-09 | House | 2nd reading |
2021-01-09 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-01-08 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-08 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-01-08 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-08 | House | 1st reading |
2021-01-08 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Capital Construction
Governor
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
State Agencies
Transportation
Budget and Financial Administration
Capital Construction
Governor
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
State Agencies
Transportation