KY HB188 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 211.336 to bar professional licensure boards from prohibiting the delivery of telehealth services to residents of Kentucky who are temporarily located outside of Kentucky by health service providers credentialed in Kentucky; bar professional licensure boards from prohibiting the delivery of telehealth services to nonresidents of Kentucky who are temporarily located in Kentucky by health service providers credentialed in the person's state of residence; and bar health care providers from being required to be physically present in their credentialing state to provide telehealth services to a person who is a resident of the same state.
Title
AN ACT relating to telehealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 397 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2142 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 57 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2142 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 57 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 68) |
2022-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | House | passed 91-0 |
2022-03-25 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-24 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-16 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-16 | House | received in House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2022-01-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-19 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Health and Medical Services
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners