KY HB184 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.7879 to allow a student who attends an out of state high school or Department of Defense school due to a parent's military transfer to earn a KEES award if the student earned a base amount in a previous year at a Kentucky high school.
Title
AN ACT relating to Kentucky Educational Excellence Scholarships.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Freeland [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 187 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-25 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-23 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | introduced in House |