KY HB173 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 16.505 to require that lump-sum payments or nonrecurring payments provided to members of the State Police Retirement System (SPRS) shall, as determined by the board, be credited when earned or classified as a lump-sum bonus and averaged over the career of the member as it relates to "creditable compensation"; require that for members entering SPRS on or after September 1, 2008, compensatory time payments excluded from "creditable compensation" apply to lump-sum compensatory time payments; make technical amendments; amend KRS 16.582 to remove language which prohibits an injury or disease resulting from military service from being considered a disabling condition for hazardous members of Kentucky Retirement Systems; require that lump-sum payments or nonrecurring payments shall, as determined by the board, be credited when earned or classified as a lump-sum bonus and averaged over the career of the member as it relates to "creditable compensation"; provide that interim positions in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System (KERS) and probationary positions in the County Employees Retirement System (CERS) shall not be renewable by the employer for the same employee unless the employee has not been employed by the agency for 12 months; require that for members entering KERS or CERS on or after September 1, 2008, compensatory time payments excluded from "creditable compensation" shall apply to lump-sum compensatory time payments; make technical amendments; amend KRS 61.542 to remove the requirement that the estate be designated as beneficiary of a member's account when he or she requests a refund of contributions prior to retirement; provide that the member's estate shall be beneficiary of his or her account from Kentucky Retirement Systems if prior to retirement the member fails to designate a beneficiary or the beneficiary designation is found to be void; provide that a beneficiary may not be changed on or after the first day of the month in which a retired employee begins receiving retirement benefits; provide that reemployed retirees who establish a second retirement account will have their estate named beneficiary if they fail to designate a beneficiary for their new account; amend KRS 61.545 to remove provisions allowing a member who is simultaneously eligible for participation in more than one retirement system administered by Kentucky Retirement Systems to select participation in only one system; make conforming amendments; amend KRS 61.552 to conform to federal law the payment options available to members for purchasing service credit; remove service purchase provisions no longer applicable to current members; require agencies that fail to report employees to the retirement system to pay penalties and interest on employer contributions from the date the contributions should have been reported to the system; make technical amendments; amend KRS 61.555 to provide that the service credit that is granted without cost to employees who are called to active duty military deployment shall be limited to those whose rights to such benefits have not been terminated under the federal Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act (USERRA); require employees participating in the hybrid cash balance plan on or after January 1, 2014, who are called to active duty military deployment to pay their employee contributions if they are granted service credit, as required by USERRA, for the period of active duty deployment; require employers to make contributions for service credited to employees who are called to active duty military deployment as required by USERRA; make conforming amendments; amend KRS 61.557 to make technical amendments; amend KRS 61.560 to prevent retirees reemployed on or after September 1, 2008, from paying into the systems; make conforming amendments; amend KRS 61.590 to make technical changes; require a retiring employee to separate employment with all participating system employers; amend KRS 61.680 to provide for consolidation of accounts with other state-administered retirement systems onlyif the member retires simultaneously from all state-administered retirement systems or retires from the other state-administered retirement systems within one month of retiring from the systems administered by Kentucky Retirement Systems; make technical amendments; amend KRS 16.520, 61.525, 61.526, 61.5525, 61.592, 61.702, 78.540, 78.610, and 78.615 to make technical and conforming amendments.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Retirement Systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 32) |
2017-03-08 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | received in House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-23 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-3 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2017-02-16 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2017 |
2017-02-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-08 | House | reassigned to State Government (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2017-01-07 | House | introduced in House |