KY HB171 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 311A to require the Kentucky Board of Emergency Medical Services to annually obtain charges billed by all air ambulance providers licensed and operating in the state and deem the information as proprietary and not subject to the Open Records Act, KRS 61.872 to 61.884, to determine the average cost of air ambulance services in the state which shall be subject to the provisions of the Open Records Act; require the board to submit the average cost to the commissioner of the Department of Insurance; authorize the board to promulgate administrative regulations to establish a form to be completed by all air ambulance service providers to determine average cost of services; amend KRS 311A.190 to require any air ambulance service providers licensed and operating in the state to comply with the submission of charges requirement; create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to require health benefit plans to prominently provide a notice in each contract for coverage whether the contract covers air ambulance service and, if provided, the dollar amount of coverage; require the commissioner of the Department of Insurance to review all health benefit plans for compliance with the notice requirement and to provide the average cost of all ambulance services to all health benefit plans every three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to emergency air ambulance services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2015-02-25Senatereceived in Senate
2015-02-24House3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute
2015-02-12Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015
2015-02-12Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 17, 2015
2015-02-12House2nd reading, to Rules
2015-02-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2015-02-06Houseposted in committee
2015-02-03Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2015-01-09Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback