KY HB16 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 258.500 to prohibit the misrepresentation of assistance dogs; allow peace officers to investigate; amend KRS 258.991 to conform and to remove outdated references.
Title
AN ACT relating to assistance dogs.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Randy Bridges [R] | Rep. Nancy Tate [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-01-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-06-14 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb16.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb16/orig_bill.pdf |