KY HB159 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-25 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-25 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.315 to make the survivors of emergency medical services providers who are killed in the line of duty eligible for the state lump-sum death benefit.
Title
AN ACT relating to emergency medical services.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Butler [R] | Rep. Robert Benvenuti [R] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] |
Rep. Bart Rowland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-09 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB159.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB159/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB159/FN.doc |