KY HB155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 405.075 to define and allow the use of a "newborn safety device" related to the anonymous surrendering of a newborn infant in the Commonwealth at a participating staffed police station, staffed fire station, or a staffed hospital.
Title
AN ACT relating to abandoned infants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1746 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 178 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 178 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 117) |
2021-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2021-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-03-04 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2021-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-11 | House | reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Emergency Medical Services
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Parental Rights
Emergency Medical Services
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Parental Rights