KY HB148 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 532.130, 532.135, and 532.140 to add a diagnosis of serious mental illness to the disabilities which prevent execution for persons convicted of capital offenses.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental illness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 167 (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 75-16 with floor amendment (1) |
2021-02-26 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-04 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |