KY HB144 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 18A.245 to include the State Treasurer as an ex officio member to the board of trustees of the Kentucky Public Employees Deferred Compensation Authority; reduce the number of at-large members from four to three; amend KRS 18A.275 to eliminate the State Treasurer as custodian of funds and require the board to select a custodian of funds collected under 18A.230 to 18A.275; amend KRS 18A.250 to conform;
Title
AN ACT relating to Kentucky Public Employees Deferred Compensation Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 970 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 70 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 70 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 153) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | received in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2019-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2019-01-10 | House | introduced in House |