KY HB133 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 102)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 281.730 to define "agricultural commodity," "farm supply for agricultural purposes," and "planting and harvesting season"; exempt drivers of vehicles transporting agricultural commodities and farm supplies for agricultural purposes within a 150 air-mile radius from a farm or distribution point during the planting and harvesting season from any provisions of 49 C.F.R. pt. 395, relating to hours of service of drivers, adopted by Transportation Cabinet.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the transportation of agricultural commodities and supplies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 578 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 36 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 102)
2018-03-21Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-21Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-21Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-21Housereceived in House
2018-03-20Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2018-03-20Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018
2018-03-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-01-23Senateto Transportation (S)
2018-01-22Senatereceived in Senate
2018-01-19House3rd reading, passed 86-0
2018-01-17Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2018-01-16Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 17, 2018
2018-01-11House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-10Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-01-08Houseposted in committee
2018-01-08Houseto Agriculture (H)
2018-01-04Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback