KY HB132 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 132.010 to define "manufactured home," "modular home," and "prefabricated home"; amend the definition of "mobile home"; amend KRS 132.200 to exempt prefabricated homes held in a manufacturer's or retailer's inventory from local property taxes; apply to property assessed on or after January 1, 2023.
Title
AN ACT relating to the ad valorem taxation of prefabricated home inventories.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Freeland [R] | Rep. Daniel Fister [R] | Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Adam Koenig [R] |
Rep. Michael Meredith [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Tom Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-12-09 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Cities
Counties
Fiscal Note
Housing, Building, and Construction
Local Mandate
Special Purpose Governmental Entities
Taxation
Taxation, Property
Counties
Fiscal Note
Housing, Building, and Construction
Local Mandate
Special Purpose Governmental Entities
Taxation
Taxation, Property