KY HB132 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 61.870 to 61.884 to prohibit a person from using a booking photograph for a commercial purpose if that photograph will be posted in a publication or on a Web site, and the removal of the booking photograph requires the payment of a fee or other consideration; amend KRS 61.870 to define "booking photograph".
Title
AN ACT relating to booking photographs and photographic records of inmates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 101) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | House | passed 99-0 |
2016-03-29 | House | House concurred in Senate committee amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2016-03-28 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendments (1) and (2-title) for Tuesday, March 29, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-03-25 | House | received in House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with committee amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2016 (Consent Orders #2) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with committee amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2016-02-17 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, (2-title) filed |
2016-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 12, 2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-12-10 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |