KY HB12 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 304-17A.148 to cap the cost sharing requirements for prescription insulin at $100 per 30 day supply; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to prescription insulin.

Sponsors

Rep. Danny Bentley [R]Rep. Steve Sheldon [R]Rep. Kimberly Banta [R]Rep. John Blanton [R]
Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D]Rep. Charles Booker [D]Rep. Adam Bowling [R]Rep. Terri Branham Clark [D]
Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R]Rep. Travis Brenda [R]Rep. Randy Bridges [R]Rep. George Brown [D]
Rep. Thomas Burch [D]Rep. McKenzie Cantrell [D]Rep. Jeffery Donohue [D]Rep. Daniel Elliott [R]
Rep. Joseph Fischer [R]Rep. Kelly Flood [D]Rep. Deanna Frazier [R]Rep. Chris Fugate [R]
Rep. Alan Gentry [D]Rep. James Glenn [D]Rep. Derrick Graham [D]Rep. Joe Graviss [D]
Rep. David Hale [R]Rep. Chris Harris [D]Rep. Mark Hart [R]Rep. Angie Hatton [D]
Rep. Richard Heath [R]Rep. Kathy Hinkle [D]Rep. Cluster Howard [D]Rep. Regina Huff [R]
Rep. Thomas Huff [R]Rep. Joni Jenkins [D]Rep. Kim King [R]Rep. Matthew Koch [R]
Rep. Nima Kulkarni [D]Rep. Stan Lee [R]Rep. Derek Lewis [R]Rep. Scott Lewis [R]
Rep. Mary Marzian [D]Rep. Ed Massey [R]Rep. Bobby McCool [R]Rep. Reginald Meeks [D]
Rep. Russ Meyer [D]Rep. Charles Miller [D]Rep. Patti Minter [D]Rep. Kimberly Moser [R]
Rep. Jason Nemes [R]Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D]Rep. Phillip Pratt [R]Rep. Melinda Prunty [R]
Rep. Rick Rand [D]Rep. Josie Raymond [D]Rep. William Reed [R]Rep. Steve Riley [R]
Rep. Rachel Roberts [D]Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R]Rep. Steven Rudy [R]Rep. Dean Schamore [D]
Rep. Attica Scott [D]Rep. John Sims [D]Rep. Maria Sorolis [D]Rep. Cherlynn Stevenson [D]
Rep. Jim Stewart [R]Rep. Wilson Stone [D]Rep. Ashley Tackett Laferty [D]Rep. Nancy Tate [R]
Rep. Walker Thomas [R]Rep. James Tipton [R]Rep. Ken Upchurch [R]Rep. Russell Webber [R]
Rep. Susan Westrom [D]Rep. Buddy Wheatley [D]Rep. Robert Wiederstein [D]Rep. Lisa Willner [D]

Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 123 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senaterecommitted to Banking & Insurance (S)
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-17Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-26Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2020-02-20Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-19House3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2020-02-18Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-18Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 19, 2020
2020-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-28Houseposted in committee
2020-01-13Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-06-04HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback