KY HB109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to establish a refundable income tax credit for the costs of mitigating noise from a commercial airport for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, but before January 1, 2026; amend KRS 131.190 to allow the department to report nonidentifying information on the credit to the Commission; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the credit.
Title
AN ACT relating to tax credits for airport noise mitigation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-12-06 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Aeronautics and Aviation
Noise Control
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Corporate
Taxation, Income--Individual
Noise Control
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Corporate
Taxation, Income--Individual
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/hb109.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/hb109/orig_bill.pdf |