KY HB1 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-01-09 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide relief to businesses and individuals during the COVID-19 state of emergency; provide guidelines for opening of businesses and schools; suspend interest on unpaid unemployment insurance contributions and provide guidelines for noncustodial parental visitation during the COVID-19 state of emergency; provide guidelines for visitation at long-term care facilities during the COVID-19 state of emergency; retroactive to March 6, 2020; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to reopening the economy in the Commonwealth of Kentucky in response to the state of emergency declared by the Governor of Kentucky beginning in March 2020 and continuing throughout the year of 2021 and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 21 (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1507 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 11 (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 10 (Y: 73 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-09Housedelivered to Governor
2021-01-09Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-01-09Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-01-09Housepassed 74-21
2021-01-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2021-01-09Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day for Concurrence or Nonconcurrence
2021-01-09Housetaken from Rules
2021-01-09Houseto Rules (H)
2021-01-09Housereceived in House
2021-01-09Senatepassed 28-7 with Committee Substitute (1)
2021-01-09Senatefloor amendments (1) (2) and (3) withdrawn
2021-01-09Senate3rd reading
2021-01-09Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, January 9, 2021
2021-01-09Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2021-01-09Senaterecommitted to State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-09Senatetaken from the Regular Orders of the Day
2021-01-08Senatefloor amendments (1) (2) and (3) filed
2021-01-08Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, January 9, 2021
2021-01-08Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2021-01-07Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-07Senate1st reading
2021-01-07Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-07Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-07Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-07Senatereceived in Senate
2021-01-07House3rd reading, passed 70-25 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) and (3)
2021-01-07Housefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-01-06Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-01-06Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 7, 2021
2021-01-06Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2021-01-05Houseposted in committee
2021-01-05Housereturned to State Government (H)
2021-01-05House1st reading
2021-01-05Housetaken from State Government (H)
2021-01-05Houseto State Government (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback