KY HB1 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-12)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 40)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]

Summary

Create KRS Chapter 65A and create new sections thereof to define terms used in the chapter; establish an online central registry for the reporting and dissemination of administrative and financial information by special purpose governmental entities; establish audit requirements for special purpose governmental entities; establish consequences for failure to comply with the reporting provisions of the chapter; establish standard dissolution provisions for special purpose governmental entities; require the Department for Local Government to provide education to the governing boards and employees of special purpose governmental entities; require special purpose governmental entities to follow ethics codes; require special purpose governmental entities to adopt an annual budget and to publicize where the adopted budget and other financial information relating to the district may be found; require all special purpose governmental entities to register with the Department for Local Government prior to December 31, 2013; amend KRS 6.764, 64.012, 65.003, 65.005, 65.065, 65.070, 65.117, 65.900, 65.905, 39F.160, 43.070, 43.075, 65.009, 65.530, 65.8925, 74.070, 75.430, 77.135, 77.140, 91.758, 91.760, 91A.360, 91A.370, 91A.372, 91A.380, 91A.570, 91A.575, 96A.190, 97.095, 97.120, 97.600, 97.720, 104.610, 107.380, 136.602, 147.635, 147A.021, 147A.090, 164.655, 173.570, 173.770, 184.080, 210.400, 212.500, 212.639, 212.794, 216.343, 220.544, 262.097, 262.280, 262.760, 262.763, 266.120, 268.170, and 273.441 to conform; create new sections of KRS 65.180 to 65.192, 65.350 to 65.375, 65.660 to 65.679, 68.600 to 68.606, 76.005 to 76.230, 76.213 to 76.240, 76.274 to 76.279, 76.295 to 76.420, 80.262 to 80.300, 80.310 to 80.610, 108.010 to 108.075, 108.080 to 108.180, KRS Chapter 109, Subtitle 50 of KRS Chapter 154, KRS Chapter 173, KRS 183.132 to 183.165, KRS 212.720 to 212.760, and KRS Chapters 267, 268, and 269 to provide that the provisions of Sections 1 to 9 of the Act apply; provide that start up expenditures shall be a necessary governmental expense; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to special purpose governmental entities, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-21Housesigned by Governor (Acts Chapter 40)
2013-03-12Housedelivered to Governor
2013-03-12Houseenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2013-03-12Housepassed 98-0
2013-03-12HouseFree Conference Committee report adopted in House
2013-03-12Housereceived in House
2013-03-12Senatepassed 38-0
2013-03-12SenateFree Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
2013-03-12SenateFree Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2013-03-12SenateFree Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2013-03-12SenateConference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
2013-03-12SenateConference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2013-03-11SenateConference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2013-03-11SenateSenate refused to recede from Committee Substitute
2013-03-11Senateposted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute
2013-03-11Senatereceived in Senate
2013-03-11HouseHouse refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute
2013-03-07Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute for Monday, March 11, 2013
2013-03-06Housereceived in House
2013-03-06Senate3rd reading, passed 23-10 with Committee Substitute
2013-03-06Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2013
2013-03-06Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2013-03-05Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2013-03-05Senate2nd reading
2013-03-05Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2013-03-04Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2013-03-04Senate1st reading
2013-03-04Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2013-02-13Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2013-02-11Senatereceived in Senate
2013-02-08House3rd reading, passed 96-1
2013-02-07Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 8, 2013
2013-02-07Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed
2013-02-06Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules Local Government (H)
2013-02-05Houseposting waived
2013-02-05Houseto Local Government (H)
2013-02-05House1st reading
2013-02-05Housetaken from Committee on Committees (H)
2013-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback