KS SCR1607 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Senate Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 22 Nay: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Senate Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 22 Nay: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making application to the United States congress to call a convention of the states for the purpose of proposing amendments to limit the federal government.
Title
Making application to the United States congress to call a convention of the states for the purpose of proposing amendments to limit the federal government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority - Yea: 22 Nay: 16 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 22 Nay: 16 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 13, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Introduced |