KS SB79 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - Senate Stricken from calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - Senate Stricken from calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax deductions and modifications and severance tax exemptions; basis of partner's interest and shareholder's stock; statutory clarification.
Title
Income tax deductions and modifications and severance tax exemptions; basis of partner's interest and shareholder's stock; statutory clarification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Stricken from calendar. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |