KS SB76 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an exemption from continuing education licensure requirements for certain insurance producers.
Title
Providing for an exemption from continuing education licensure requirements for certain insurance producers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |