KS SB72 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax exemption for health clubs.
Title
Property tax exemption for health clubs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 25 Nay: 14 (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected - Yea: 15 Nay: 23 (Y: 8 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected - Yea: 15 Nay: 23 (Y: 8 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 03, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2013-03-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2013-03-26 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 25 Nay: 14 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed on Monday, 25 March 2013 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected Yea: 15 Nay: 23 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hensley |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 27, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |