KS SB7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Moving the dates for school board officer elections and organizational meetings and amending the manner of submitting to voters proposed changes to a school district’s manner of election and voting plan.
Title
Moving the dates for school board officer elections and organizational meetings and amending the manner of submitting to voters proposed changes to a school district’s manner of election and voting plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Hawk [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Elections |
2019-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N |
2019-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2019-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 37 Nay: 2 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 6, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 11, 2019 |