KS SB554 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the definition of land devoted to agricultural use for property tax purposes to include incidental agritourism activity and zoos.
Title
Amending the definition of land devoted to agricultural use for property tax purposes to include incidental agritourism activity and zoos.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |