KS SB53 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - House Referred to Committee on Taxation
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - House Referred to Committee on Taxation
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding manufacturers' coupons from the sales or selling price for sales tax purposes.
Title
Excluding manufacturers' coupons from the sales or selling price for sales tax purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-03-13 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 2, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |