KS SB53 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 53 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Amending the personal and family protection act.
Title
Substitute for SB 53 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Amending the personal and family protection act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |