KS SB5 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Board of healing arts; licensure and education of perfusionists.
Title
Board of healing arts; licensure and education of perfusionists.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Kelsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in House Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 784 Docking | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-16 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-15 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-14 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-02-14 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced |