KS SB47 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas pet animal act.
Title
Amending the Kansas pet animal act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture |
2017-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 582-N |
2017-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELLED |
2017-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2017-02-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 5 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |