KS SB451 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating statutory references related to the Kansas department for aging and disability services and the Kansas department for children and families in accordance with 2012 executive reorganization order no. 41.
Title
Updating statutory references related to the Kansas department for aging and disability services and the Kansas department for children and families in accordance with 2012 executive reorganization order no. 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 22, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb451/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb451_00_0000.pdf |