KS SB447 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of the possession of weapons.
Title
Regulation of the possession of weapons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 2 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2014-04-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 34 Nay: 2 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 24, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |