KS SB426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making certain contract requirements for farm equipment and dealership agreements for farm equipment, outdoor power equipment and lawn and garden equipment.
Title
Making certain contract requirements for farm equipment and dealership agreements for farm equipment, outdoor power equipment and lawn and garden equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 546-S |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb426/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb426_00_0000.pdf |