KS SB423 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Sedgwick county urban area nuisance abatement act.
Title
Establishing the Sedgwick county urban area nuisance abatement act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 30 Nay: 7 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-03-18 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 30 Nay: 7 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 5, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |