KS SB42 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the meaning of the terms "rebate" and "interest" as used in the real estate brokers' and salespersons' license act.
Title
Amending the meaning of the terms "rebate" and "interest" as used in the real estate brokers' and salespersons' license act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |