KS SB41 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a remittance credit to retailers for the collection of sales and compensating use tax.
Title
Providing a remittance credit to retailers for the collection of sales and compensating use tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died on Calendar |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |