KS SB358 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; authorizing tastings by manufacturer licensees.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; authorizing tastings by manufacturer licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in House Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-02-29 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-23 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 144-S | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced |