KS SB35 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Operation of transit buses on certain right shoulders in Wyandotte county.
Title
Operation of transit buses on certain right shoulders in Wyandotte county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |