KS SB334 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Monday, 21 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Monday, 21 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting military drivers from CDL testing requirements.
Title
Exempting military drivers from CDL testing requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 7 Nay: 30 (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 7 Nay: 30 (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Approved by Governor on Monday, 21 May 2012 | |
2012-05-18 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 18, 2012 | |
2012-05-11 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2012-05-11 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-10 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-10 | Conference committee report now available | |
2012-04-25 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hayzlett, Representative Prescott and Representative Wetta appointed as second conferees | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Umbarger, Senator Marshall and Senator Kultala appointed as second conferees | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Umbarger, Senator Marshall and Senator Kultala appointed as second conferees | |
2012-03-30 | Motion to Reconsider Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 7 Nay: 30 | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-30 | Conference committee report now available | |
2012-03-20 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hayzlett, Representative Prescott and Representative Wetta appointed as conferees | |
2012-03-19 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Umbarger , Senator Marshall and Senator Kultala as conferees | |
2012-03-15 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Goico was adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Goico | |
2012-03-09 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 783 Docking | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-23 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-23 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-02-14 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 152-S | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced |