KS SB31 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding U.S.D. No. 207, Fort Leavenworth and virtual school students from the capital improvements state aid determination.
Title
Excluding U.S.D. No. 207, Fort Leavenworth and virtual school students from the capital improvements state aid determination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |