KS SB274 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the scope of practice, discipline by the board, and license renewal procedures for naturopathic doctors.
Title
Amending the scope of practice, discipline by the board, and license renewal procedures for naturopathic doctors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 9, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |