KS SB226 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for area agencies on aging for certain purchases of tangible personal property and services.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for area agencies on aging for certain purchases of tangible personal property and services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |