KS SB209 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restrictions on third party solicitations to registered voters to file an application for an advance voting ballot.
Title
Restrictions on third party solicitations to registered voters to file an application for an advance voting ballot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |