KS SB193 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 10 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 10 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 193 by Committee on Education - Requiring a degree prospectus for postsecondary degree programs.
Title
House Substitute for SB 193 by Committee on Education - Requiring a degree prospectus for postsecondary degree programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 91 Nay: 30 (Y: 91 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 27 Nay: 11 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 91 Nay: 30 (Y: 91 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 27 Nay: 11 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 10 , 2016 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 09, 2016 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-30 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Senator Hensley replaces Senator Kelly on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Senator Arpke replaces Senator Denning on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Senator Abrams replaces Senator Masterson on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-30 | House | House Representative Ousley replaces Representative Winn on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-30 | House | House Representative Dove replaces Representative Lunn on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-30 | House | House Representative O'Brien replaces Representative Highland on the Conference Committee |
2016-03-17 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Highland, Representative Lunn and Representative Winn appointed as conferees |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Masterson , Senator Denning and Senator Kelly as conferees |
2016-03-10 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 90 Nay: 31 |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highland was adopted |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highland |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2015-05-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, May 06, 2015, 12:00 PM Room 112-N |
2015-05-01 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, May 05, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2015-04-30 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-03-30 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 31, 2015, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2015-03-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 11 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Melcher was adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Melcher |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 24, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |