KS SB191 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for the involuntary discharge or transfer of a resident in an adult residential care facility, the right to appeal such discharge or transfer and a process for such appeal.
Title
Establishing requirements for the involuntary discharge or transfer of a resident in an adult residential care facility, the right to appeal such discharge or transfer and a process for such appeal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |