KS SB191 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax lid exception for transportation construction projects.
Title
Tax lid exception for transportation construction projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb191/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb191_00_0000.pdf |