KS SB156 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Governmental ethics; campaign finance; increased donation, contribution and gift amounts.
Title
Governmental ethics; campaign finance; increased donation, contribution and gift amounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |