KS SB136 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandatory expungement of arrest records of a person arrested as a result of mistaken identity or identity theft.
Title
Mandatory expungement of arrest records of a person arrested as a result of mistaken identity or identity theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Senator Haley raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Fitzgerald |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |