KS SB131 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

When township officials take the oath of office and the deadline for filing for municipal office when no primary is held.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

When township officials take the oath of office and the deadline for filing for municipal office when no primary is held.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections
2019-03-14HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Elections
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bowers was adopted
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bowers
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2019-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 142-S
2019-02-11SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2019-02-08SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback