KS SB101 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for area agencies on aging.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for area agencies on aging.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 9, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |