KS S0581 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Summary
Hiram Price Dillon House transfer to Kansas arts commission. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Hiram Price Dillon House transfer to Kansas arts commission. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died on General Orders in House | |
2010-05-08 | Mtn. to move to 1st order of bus on GO 5/10/10 -HJ 1802 | |
2010-05-04 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -HJ 1450 | |
2010-05-03 | CR: Be passed by Appropriations -HJ 1414 | |
2010-03-30 | Withdrawn from General Government Budget -HJ 1328; Referred to Appropriations -HJ 1328 | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to General Government Budget -HJ 1255 | |
2010-03-23 | Received and introduced -HJ 1254 | |
2010-03-23 | FA: Passed; Yeas 37 Nays 3 -SJ 1242 | |
2010-03-22 | COW: Be passed -SJ 1236 | |
2010-03-18 | CR: Be passed by Ways and Means -SJ 1219 | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1201 | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced -SJ 1191 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |