KS S0575 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Summary
Equalizing distribution of overpayments and under payments from the special city and county highway fund during fiscal years 2011 through 2015. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Equalizing distribution of overpayments and under payments from the special city and county highway fund during fiscal years 2011 through 2015. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in House committee | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Transportation -HJ 1299 | |
2010-03-24 | Received and introduced -HJ 1277 | |
2010-03-23 | COW: Be passed -SJ 1247; EFA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1255 | |
2010-03-18 | CR: Be passed by Ways and Means -SJ 1219 | |
2010-03-12 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1185 | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 1166 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |