KS S0572 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Line item vetoes sustained -SJ 1627
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Line item vetoes sustained -SJ 1627
Summary
Appropriations for FY 2010 through FY 2015 for various state agencies, omnibus appropriation act and omnibus reconciliation spending limit bill for the 2010 regular session. Effective date: 06/10/2010.
Title
Appropriations for FY 2010 through FY 2015 for various state agencies, omnibus appropriation act and omnibus reconciliation spending limit bill for the 2010 regular session. Effective date: 06/10/2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Line item vetoes sustained -SJ 1627 | |
2010-05-27 | Sec72(c),76(h),79(l),94(j),107(c),163,165,167,168 | |
2010-05-27 | except line item veto: Portion of Sec. 46(b) & 91(a), | |
2010-05-27 | Approved by gov. -SJ 1623 | |
2010-05-18 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 1623 | |
2010-05-11 | Reengrossed -SJ 1622 | |
2010-05-10 | Concurred; Yeas 21 Nays 17 -SJ 1604; Returned to senate | |
2010-05-10 | Acceded; apptd Yoder, Merrick, Feuerborn -HJ 1807 | |
2010-05-08 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Emler, Vratil, Kelly -SJ 1597 | |
2010-05-08 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 71 Nays 52 -HJ 1783 | |
2010-05-07 | COW: -HJ 1540; Be further am. -HJ 1540; Rose and reported -HJ 1731; COW: -HJ 1735; Be further am. -HJ 1735; Rose and reported -HJ 1746; COW: -HJ 1749; Be further am. -HJ 1749; Be passed as am. -HJ 1771 | |
2010-05-06 | COW: -HJ 1508 | |
2010-05-04 | COW: -HJ 1451; Be further am. -HJ 1451; Rose and reported -HJ 1452; COW: -HJ 1458; Be further am. -HJ 1459; Motion to recommend for passage, failed -HJ 1459 | |
2010-05-03 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -HJ 1415 | |
2010-04-29 | Withdrawn from calendar, rereferred to Appropriations -HJ 1394; CR: A substitute be passed as am. by Appropriations -HJ 1400 | |
2010-04-28 | CR: Substitute be passed by Appropriations -HJ 1390; Substitute introduced & placed on General Orders -HJ 1390 | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Appropriations -HJ 1312 | |
2010-03-29 | Received and introduced -HJ 1301 | |
2010-03-25 | Engrossed -SJ 1291 | |
2010-03-24 | COW: CR be adptd; be further am.; be passed as am. -SJ 1268; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1280 | |
2010-03-19 | CR: Be passed as am. by Ways and Means -SJ 1227 | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1166 | |
2010-03-10 | Introduced -SJ 1151 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |